Center for Biological Diversity v. US Fish and Wildlife Service

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: US Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 5:2018cv01312
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Northeastern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by US Fish and Wildlife Service.(Marshall, Mary)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/27/2018. (KSS)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/26/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 9:30 AM; Bench Trial set for 4/13/2020 at 9:00 AM; in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/26/2018. (AFS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Return served c/o Attorney General, #2 Return served c/o US Attorney)(Martin, Mark)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity. US Fish and Wildlife Service served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Service c/o US Attorney, #2 Service c/o Attorney General)(Martin, Mark)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 5:18-cv-1312-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by US Fish and Wildlife Service.(Marshall, Mary)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of US Fish and Wildlife Service (Marshall, Mary)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to US Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to US Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL )
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amy R. Atwood; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elisa Pautler Bennett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/17/18. (LBG, )
August 17, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3154584 (B4601091384). (Martin, Mark)
August 17, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3154581 (B4601091985). (Martin, Mark)
August 17, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3154574 (B4601091383). related document #1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against US Fish and Wildlife Service filed by Center for Biological Diversity.(AHI). (Martin, Mark)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave for Elisa Pautler Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Martin, Mark) Modified on 8/17/2018 (SPT).
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave for Amy R. Atwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Martin, Mark) Modified on 8/17/2018 (SPT ).
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. filed by Center for Biological Diversity (Martin, Mark)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against US Fish and Wildlife Service filed by Center for Biological Diversity.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. US Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Mark E Martin
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Amy R Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Represented By: Jay E Town, US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?