Calloway et al v. Oakes Farms Inc
Plaintiff: Joe B. Calloway and Cynthia Calloway
Defendant: Oakes Farms Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv01356
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - This case is being reassigned from Judge Haikala to Judge Liles Burke. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1356-LCB on all subsequent pleadings (AHI)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oakes Farms Inc. filed by Oakes Farms Inc (Swain, Jennifer)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Cynthia Calloway, Joe B. Calloway by Oakes Farms Inc.(Swain, Jennifer)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Attorney Jennifer F. Swain has moved to admit Steven J. Bracci pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #9 ). The Court GRANTS the Motion. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/26/2018. (YMB)
September 25, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3181333 (B4601092255). (Swain, Jennifer) Modified on 9/27/2018 (AHI).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #10 ). Oakes Farms, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint on or before 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/21/2018. (YMB)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint [UNOPPOSED] by Oakes Farms Inc. (Swain, Jennifer)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Steven Bracci by Oakes Farms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Steven Bracci, #2 Exhibit FL Bar Website, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Swain, Jennifer)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Calloway, Joe B. Calloway. Oakes Farms Inc served on 9/1/2018, answer due 9/22/2018. (Willoughby, Katie)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Oakes Farms Inc. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that this case is hereby REASSIGNED to Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala for all further proceedings. Please use case number 5:18-cv-1356-UJH-MHH on all future pleadings. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 8/28/2018. (KWC)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 8/24/2018. (KWC)
August 24, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3159327 (B4601091516). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Oakes Farms Inc filed by Cynthia Calloway, Joe B. Calloway. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AHI). (Hammond, Clark)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding case assigned to unassigned judge; this case has been referred to Judge Hopkins until further notice. Please use case number 5:18-CV-1356-UJH-VEH on all subsequent pleadings (AHI)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cynthia Calloway, Joe B. Calloway (AHI)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oakes Farms Inc filed by Cynthia Calloway, Joe B. Calloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calloway et al v. Oakes Farms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe B. Calloway
Represented By: Clark R Hammond
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Willoughby
Represented By: Sheena Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Calloway
Represented By: Clark R Hammond
Represented By: Katie Elizabeth Willoughby
Represented By: Sheena Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakes Farms Inc
Represented By: Steven J Bracci
Represented By: Jennifer F Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?