Carter v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Elizabeth R. Carter
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv01380
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/22/18. (LBG, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 10/22/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by United States of America. (Wilcove, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth R. Carter. United States of America served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Pulliam, Maxwell)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth R. Carter. United States of America served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Pulliam, Maxwell)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Elizabeth R. Carter of Filing Redacted Exhibit C to Complaint (Pulliam, Maxwell)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Elizabeth R. Carter of Filing Redacted Exhibit B to Complaint (Pulliam, Maxwell)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal; granting #5 Motion to Seal Document Exhibits B and C to Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the redacted Exhibits B and C separately, as a notice, by August 31, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/30/18. (LBG, )
August 28, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3161621 (B4601091583). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against United States of America filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Pulliam, Maxwell) Modified on 8/30/2018 (BJL, ).
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Exhibits B and C to Complaint, MOTION to Seal Document by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Pulliam, Maxwell)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail as to Jay Town filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (BJL)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service as to Attorney General Jeff Sessions by certified mail filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (BJL)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against United States of America filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #4 Redacted Exhibit B, #5 Redacted Exhibit C) (BJL, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael N Wilcove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth R. Carter
Represented By: Oscar Monfort Price, IV
Represented By: Maxwell H Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?