Eric Ingram v. State Court of Clayton County et al
Plaintiff: United States of America Republic and Eric Ingram
Defendant: Brian Kemp, Henry Joesph, State Court of Clayton County and Michael T Garrett
Case Number: 5:2018cv01566
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER the plaintiff's petition for exemption of all fees #4 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/16/2018. (AFS)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Petition for Exemption of All Fees by Eric Ingram (AFS)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER because the plaintiff does not have proper representation, the plaintiff asserts claims against defendants who are immune from suit and venue is not proper in the Northern District of Alabama, the plaintiff's claims are due to be dismissed. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/9/2018. (AFS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing by United States of America Republic (AFS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case Alleging Breach of Contract against Michael T Garrett, Henry Joesph, Brian Kemp, State Court of Clayton County, filed by United States of America Republic.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Ingram v. State Court of Clayton County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Joesph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Court of Clayton County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?