Kent v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Shawnna Leshelle Kent
Defendant: Lillian Dee Williams and Dow Agrosciences LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01695
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 12/6/2018. (AHI)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Lillian Dee Williams.(Moltz, Evan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Dow Agrosciences LLC.(Moltz, Evan)
October 16, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3196178 (B4601092747). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lillian Dee Williams and Dow Agrosciences LLC from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2018-901710.00 filed by Lillian Dee Williams, Dow Agrosciences LLC. with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(AHI). (Moltz, Evan)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Dow Agrosciences LLC (AHI)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lillian Dee Williams and Dow Agrosciences LLC from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2018-901710.00 filed by Lillian Dee Williams, Dow Agrosciences LLC. with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnna Leshelle Kent
Represented By: Mark A Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Dee Williams
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Agrosciences LLC
Represented By: Evan P Moltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?