Jackson et al v. Madison County Board of Registrars et al
Plaintiff: Jordon Jackson, Simeon Sykes, Kendra Jones and Terry Matthews, III
Defendant: Lynda Hariston, Madison County Board of Registrars and John Merrill
Case Number: 5:2018cv01855
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Alter Deadlines. (Doc. #28 ). Plaintiffs have until 1/28/2019 to file an amended complaint. Defendants are given 21 days from the filing of an amended complaint to file their responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/21/2018. (YMB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint Motion to Alter Deadlines) by Jordon Jackson. (Meza, Catherine)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion to Alter Deadlines. (Doc. #26 ). Plaintiffs have until 12/28/2018 to dismiss their case unilaterally, to file an amended complaint, or to stand on their current complaint. Defendants are given 21 days from the filing of an amended complaint or notice of intent to stand on the current complaint - or from the December 28, 2018 deadline, if no notice or new complaint is filed - to file their responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/28/2018. (YMB)
November 27, 2018 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Time Sensitive Joint Motion to Alter Deadlines) by Lynda Hariston, Madison County Board of Registrars, John Merrill. (Messick, Misty)
November 26, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by J Jeffery Rich on behalf of Lynda Hariston, Madison County Board of Registrars (Rich, J)
November 21, 2018 Filing 24 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/2018, before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Martin. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (KEK)
November 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3218092 (ALND B4601093515). (Murray, Walter) Modified on 11/15/2018 (KEK).
November 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3218090 (ALND B4601093513). (Meza, Catherine) Modified on 11/15/2018 (KEK).
November 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3218089 (ALND B4601093514). (Harawa, Daniel) Modified on 11/15/2018 (KEK).
November 14, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3217427 (ALND B4601093499). (Spital, Samuel) Modified on 11/14/2018 (KEK).
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 Exhibit List re 11/13/2018 Evidentiary Hearing by Defendants Lynda Hariston, Madison County Board of Registrars, and John Merrill. (Attachments: #1 DX 1, #2 DX 2, #3 DX 3, #4 DX 4, #5 DX 5, #6 DX 6, #7 DX 7)(YMB)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Consistent with the remarks made during the November 13, 2018 evidentiary hearing on the plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order, the Court denies the plaintiffs' motion. (Doc. #4 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/13/2018. (KEK)
November 13, 2018 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/13/2018. Oral arguments. Plffs' testimony. Dfts' testimony. DXs 1-7 admitted into evidence. Court's findings stated on the record. Adj. (Court Reporter Julie Martin.) (YMB)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Attorney Kerri Johnson Riley has moved to admit Kerrel Murray pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #18 ). The Court GRANTS the Motion. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/13/2018. (YMB)
November 12, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Simeon Sykes. filed by Simeon Sykes (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration)(Riley, Kerri)
November 12, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Simeon Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Consent, #2 Cert Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Riley, Kerri)
November 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Misty Shawn Fairbanks Messick on behalf of All Defendants (Messick, Misty)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: At the evidentiary hearing on November 13, 2018, the Court will examine the plaintiffs' effort to register to vote in advance of October 22, 2018 and any other relevant evidence concerning the plaintiffs' efforts to have the defendants count the provisional ballots that the plaintiffs cast on November 6, 2018. The Court lifts its recent order, Doc. 13 with respect to all provisional ballots other than the plaintiffs' provisional ballots. For any party or witness unable to appear in person for the November 13, 2018 hearing, the Court asks the party or witness to please dial (877) 873-8018 and dial access code 5313999 to participate in the hearing. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/09/2018. (EES)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court SETS this matter for an Evidentiary Hearing at 9:30 AM on Tuesday, 11/13/2018, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/9/2018. (YMB)
November 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala: Telephone Conference re #4 Motion for TRO held on 11/9/2018. (Court Reporter Christina Decker.) (YMB)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordon Jackson, Kendra Jones, Simeon Sykes, Terry Matthews, III. John Merrill served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: In their motion for a temporary restraining order, the plaintiffs assert that "Defendant Madison County Board of Registrars is in the process of certifying provisional ballots [for the November 6, 2018 election] and will complete this process on Friday, November 9, 2018." (Doc. 4, p. 2). The plaintiffs ask the Court, among other things, to compel the defendants "to certify and count" the provisional ballots that the plaintiffs case on November 6, 2018. The Court directs the registrar not to conclude the certification of provisional ballots for the November 6, 2018 election until the Court hears from the parties in this matter and issues further orders concerning the plaintiffs' pending motion for a TRO. (Doc. #4 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/9/2018. (JLC)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Attorneys Catherine Meza, Samuel Spital, and Daniel S. Harawa have moved for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Docs. #6 , #7 , and #11 ). The Court GRANTS the Motions. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/9/2018. (YMB)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jordon Jackson, Kendra Jones, Terry Matthews, III, Simeon Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Cert of Standing)(Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordon Jackson, Kendra Jones, Simeon Sykes, Terry Matthews, III. Lynda Hariston served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordon Jackson, Kendra Jones, Simeon Sykes, Terry Matthews, III. Madison County Board of Registrars served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable Madeline H. Haikala. Please use case number 5:18-cv-1855-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 11/9/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Simeon Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Consent, #2 Cert Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 11/9/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Simeon Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Consent, #2 Cert Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Brief re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Simeon Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)(Riley, Kerri)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lynda Hariston, Madison County Board of Registrars, and John Merrill by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
November 9, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601003777. (BJL)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lynda Hariston, Madison County Board of Registrars, and John Merrill filed by Jordon Jackson, Kendra Jones, Simeon Sykes, and Terry Matthews, III.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Madison County Board of Registrars et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordon Jackson
Represented By: Daniel S Harawa
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kerri Johnson Riley
Represented By: Kerrel Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simeon Sykes
Represented By: Daniel S Harawa
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kerri Johnson Riley
Represented By: Kerrel Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Jones
Represented By: Daniel S Harawa
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kerri Johnson Riley
Represented By: Kerrel Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Matthews, III
Represented By: Daniel S Harawa
Represented By: Samuel Spital
Represented By: Catherine Meza
Represented By: Kerri Johnson Riley
Represented By: Kerrel Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Hariston
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks Messick
Represented By: J Jeffery Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Board of Registrars
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks Messick
Represented By: J Jeffery Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Merrill
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks Messick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?