Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Martinez
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Isidro Martinez and El Rey Del Mar Marisqueria
Case Number: 5:2018cv01934
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to El Rey Del Mar Marisqueria and Isidro Martinez by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (SPT )
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Gamble, F.)
November 27, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3224936 (B4601093707). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Isidro Martinez filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(AHI). (Gamble, F.) Modified on 11/28/2018 (AHI).
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Isidro Martinez filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc and El Rey Del Mar Marisqueria.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Rey Del Mar Marisqueria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?