Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Alburl et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Scott Alburl, Christopher W. Anderson, SIDELINES33 LLC and Angie Alburl
Case Number: 5:2018cv01935
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for services as to Scott Alburl. (AHI)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Angie Alburl, Christopher W. Anderson, and SIDELINES33 LLC by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (SPT )
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Gamble, F.)
November 27, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3224944 9B4601093708). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Angie Alburl, Scott Alburl, Christopher W. Anderson, and SIDELINES33 LLC filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(AHI). (Gamble, F.) Modified on 11/28/2018 (AHI).
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angie Alburl, Scott Alburl, Christopher W. Anderson, and SIDELINES33 LLC filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Alburl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Alburl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDELINES33 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Alburl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?