Doe et al v. Stoneridge Homes, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe and John Doe
Defendant: American Southern Homes, LLC, Stoneridge Homes, Inc. and John O. Wright
Case Number: 5:2018cv02101
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants answer or other response due by March 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 01/29/2019. (LMC, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time (UNOPPOSED) Motion is RIPE 1/29/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by American Southern Homes, LLC, Stoneridge Homes, Inc., John O. Wright. (Canupp, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Southern Homes, LLC, Stoneridge Homes, Inc., and John O. Wright by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit _A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Zwilling, Edward)
December 27, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601094275 (BJL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Southern Homes, LLC, Stoneridge Homes, Inc., and John O. Wright filed by Jane Doe and John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Stoneridge Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Southern Homes, LLC
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoneridge Homes, Inc.
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O. Wright
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Edward I Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Edward I Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?