Underwood v. Richie et al

Petitioner: David Tinsley Underwood
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The and P Richie
Case Number: 5:2019cv00036
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Referring Judge: T Michael Putnam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition - Traverse to re #6 Respondents' answer to the habeas petition filed by David Tinsley Underwood. (KAM)
February 22, 2019 MOTION for Summary Judgment (see order #7 treating #6 as motion for summary judgment by Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, P Richie. (KAM)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the court deems this case ripe for summary disposition; petitioner shall have 21 days to submit any additional evidentiary materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/21/2019. (KAM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, P Richie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex-A Pt-1, #2 Exhibit Ex-A Pt-2, #3 Exhibit Ex-A Pt-3, #4 Exhibit Ex-A Pt-4, #5 Exhibit Ex-B, #6 Exhibit Ex-C, #7 Exhibit Ex-D, #8 Exhibit Ex-E, #9 Exhibit Ex-F, #10 Exhibit Ex-G, #11 Exhibit Ex-H, #12 Exhibit Ex-I, #13 Exhibit Ex-J, #14 Exhibit Ex-K, #15 Exhibit Ex-L, #16 Exhibit Ex-M)(Poe, Beth)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Slate Poe on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, P Richie (Poe, Beth)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Respondents are hereby ORDERED to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/1/2019. (JLC)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is not required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days,. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/14/2019. (KAM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Tinsley Underwood. (KAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2019: #1 complete pages) (KAM, ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David Tinsley Underwood.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood v. Richie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P Richie
Represented By: Beth Slate Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Tinsley Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?