O'Neal v. United States of America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Wendell Dwayne O'Neal
Defendant: United States of America Inc and T. Patrick Martin
Case Number: 5:2019cv00090
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act / Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER denying #9 MOTION for Amended Judgment is DENIED. This case was dismissed with prejudice on January 25, 2019 and is now closed. The plaintiff is hereby advised that any further documents or motions filed by him in this closed action will not be considered by the Court. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/26/2019. (CT)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 JUDICIAL NOTICE for Case Matter Dismissal by Wendell Dwayne O'Neal (AHI)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Amended Judgment to Permit Complaint for Remedy Exhaustion by Wendell Dwayne O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter with case number 5:19-CV-90-LCB)(AHI)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT that in accordance with the Memorandum Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith and Rule 58, Fed. R. Civ. P., the court DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE for failing to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/25/2019. (AHI)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION the court GRANTS Plaintiff's Application to proceed IFP and the court DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE for failing to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/25/2019. (AHI )
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:19-cv-90-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER are more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/18/19. (BJL)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING by Wendell Dwayne O'Neal. (BJL)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Filed by Wendell Dwayne O'Neal. (BJL)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T. Patrick Martin and United States of America Inc filed by Wendell Dwayne O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Addendum Exhibits Supporting Judicial Review, #2 Exhibit Federal Tort Claim)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. United States of America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Patrick Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Dwayne O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?