Rose v. Blakely, et al
Plaintiff: Jason Ray Rose
Defendant: Sidney Townsand, Mike Blakely, Vanessa Rich, Tammy Waddell, Jackie McNatt and Roy Brooks
Case Number: 5:2019cv00123
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Jason Ray Rose. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/18/2019. (KAM)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Jason Ray Rose. (KEK)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that that the plaintiff must signed and return the Prisoner Consent Form within 15 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 3/5/2019. (KAM)
February 6, 2019 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 6.80, receipt number B4601095218 (KAM)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER terming motion or declaration for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee of $6.80, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 1/23/2019. (KAM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Ray Rose. (KAM)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Blakely, Roy Brooks, Jackie McNatt, Vanessa Rich, Sidney Townsand, Tammy Waddell, filed by Jason Ray Rose.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Blakely, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Townsand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Blakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie McNatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ray Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?