Wells Fargo Bank National Association v. Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Defendant: Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center and Asher A Turney
Case Number: 5:2019cv00247
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Asher A Turney served on 3/2/2019, answer due 3/23/2019. (Shaver, Andrew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (Shaver, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center and Asher A Turney for service by Plaintiff. (BJL)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Shaver, Andrew)
February 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3276660. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center and Asher A Turney filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Glover, Glenn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center and Asher A Turney filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank National Association v. Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Medicine: Hwy 53 Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher A Turney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Glenn Edward Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?