Mason v. CVS Health Corporation
Plaintiff: Judy Mason
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation and Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00257
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Judy Mason SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY (Middleton, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC.(Sydnor, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3281670 (ALND B4601095492) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Health Corporation from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2019-900119, filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(KEK). (Sydnor, James) Modified on 2/19/2019 (KEK).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS defendant's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party Defendant. (Doc. #2 ). The Court directs the Clerk to substitute Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC for named party defendant CVS Health Corporation. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/12/2019. (YMB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation. filed by CVS Health Corporation (Sydnor, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by CVS Health Corporation. (Sydnor, James)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Health Corporation from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2019-900119, filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Mason
Represented By: William Louis Middleton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?