Gholamkhas v. MAT INC

Plaintiff: Valiollah Gholamkhas
Defendant: MAT INC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00280
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12117ad
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal by April 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/27/19. (LBG, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Motion is RIPE 3/27/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Valiollah Gholamkhas. (Zhuromskaya, Anna)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the Court STAYS all current deadlines. Plaintiff shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal by March 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/7/19. (BJL)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Valiollah Gholamkhas (Zhuromskaya, Anna) Modified on 3/6/2019 (BJL).
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valiollah Gholamkhas. MAT INC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (BJL)
February 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601003935 (BJL)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MAT INC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valiollah Gholamkhas (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Valiollah Gholamkhas. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAT INC filed by Valiollah Gholamkhas.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gholamkhas v. MAT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valiollah Gholamkhas
Represented By: Anna Zhuromskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?