Bowling v. Mapco Express Inc

Plaintiff: Margaret Bowling
Defendant: Mapco Express Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00281
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Remand to State Court as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/8/19. (BJL)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Margaret Bowling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Tammy)
February 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601095500 (BJL)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than April 1, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/19/19. (BJL)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Telephone Conference 3/25/2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/19/19. (BJL)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/19/19. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MAPCO EXPRESS INC by Mapco Express Inc.(BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mapco Express Inc. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF REMOVAL by Mapco Express Inc. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Mapco Express Inc from The Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-900095. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BJL) Modified on 2/20/2019 (BJL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowling v. Mapco Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapco Express Inc
Represented By: Virginia F Gambacurta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Bowling
Represented By: Tammy M Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?