Tcherneshoff v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Lyndon Tcherneshoff
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan and Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee
Case Number: 5:2019cv00284
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than May 23, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/9/19. (BJL)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 5/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/9/19. (BJL)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/9/19. (BJL)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to the Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal within fourteen (14) days from the entry date of this order. Defendants shall file any reply within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 4/9/19. (BJL)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee, Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan. filed by Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee, Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan (Miller, T)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee, Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan.(Miller, T)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee, Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan)(Miller, T)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint by April 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 3/15/19. (LBG, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 3/14/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee, Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan. (Miller, T)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyndon Tcherneshoff. Defendant Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee served with do delivery date given on the green card. (BJL)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyndon Tcherneshoff. Defendant Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plain served with no delivery date given on the green card. (BJL)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lyndon Tcherneshoff. Northrop Grumman Corporation served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee, Northrop Grumman Corporation, and The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lyndon Tcherneshoff. (BJL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee, Northrop Grumman Corporation, and The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan (Filing fee $ 400.00 H4601003933) filed by Lyndon Tcherneshoff.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tcherneshoff v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Virginia Druhan Bullock
Represented By: T Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northrop Grumman Electronic Systems Executive Pension Plan
Represented By: Virginia Druhan Bullock
Represented By: T Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Benefits Plan Administrative Committee
Represented By: Virginia Druhan Bullock
Represented By: T Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndon Tcherneshoff
Represented By: John R Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?