Smartt v. City of Huntsville Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Reuben Smartt
Defendant: Mark Russell, Jennie Robinson, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr and City of Huntsville Alabama
Case Number: 5:2019cv00308
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) by City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell. (Canupp, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 Brief re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell. (Canupp, David)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell. (Canupp, David)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell, filed by Reuben Smartt.(Wiggins, Gregory)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reuben Smartt. Devyn Keith served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019; Jennie Robinson served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019; Mark Russell served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (KAM)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Huntsville Alabama (no date on green card); Will Culver(no date on green card; Bill Kling, Jr (no date on green card). (AFS)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 Alias Summons Issued as to City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell mailed certified mail. (AFS)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 Request for service by certified mail filed by Reuben Smartt. (Wiggins, Gregory)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W Jent on behalf of Reuben Smartt (Jent, Kevin)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #7 MOTION to Dismiss; denying #9 Unopposed MOTION to Stay. Plaintiff has until 4/5/2019 to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/22/2019. (AFS)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Judge Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-cv-308-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay (UNOPPOSED) by City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell. (Canupp, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Brief re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell. (Canupp, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, Mark Russell. (Canupp, David)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reuben Smartt. Defendants Bill Kling, Jr., Devyn Keith, and City of Huntsville, Alabama served. No delivery dates given on any of the green cards. (BJL)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reuben Smartt. Defendants Will Culver, Mark Russell, and Jennie Robinson served with no delivery dates given on any of the green cards. (BJL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, and Mark Russell by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Reuben Smartt. (BJL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against City of Huntsville Alabama, Will Culver, Devyn Keith, Bill Kling, Jr, Jennie Robinson, and Mark Russell (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number B4601095543) filed by Reuben Smartt.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smartt v. City of Huntsville Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Russell
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Robinson
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Culver
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devyn Keith
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Kling, Jr
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Huntsville Alabama
Represented By: James Bradley Emmons
Represented By: David J Canupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reuben Smartt
Represented By: Gregory O Wiggins
Represented By: Kevin W Jent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?