Naravaez v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Plaintiff: Evelyn Naravaez
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00576
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0151ta
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than August 15, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/2/19. (BJL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 7/31/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/2/19. (BJL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/2/19. (BJL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A..(Miller, Zachary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Miller, Zachary)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to Plaintiff's complaint by July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/30/19. (LBG, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaitniff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/30/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Miller, Zachary)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evelyn Naravaez. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. (Blacksher, Wesley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
April 18, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3326824 (receipt number B4601096927). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. filed by Evelyn Naravaez.(BJL). (Blacksher, Wesley) Modified on 4/19/2019 (BJL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. filed by Evelyn Naravaez.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naravaez v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Zachary D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Naravaez
Represented By: Wesley Haas Blacksher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?