Industrial Manufacturing Specialties Inc v. Federal Express Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Industrial Manufacturing Specialties Inc
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System Inc, FedEx Corporate Services Inc and Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00591
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 3/2/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 5/4/2020; Trial ready by 6/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/12/2019. (AHI)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Anderson, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 06/04/19. (SPT )
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Federal Express Corporation.(Anderson, Andrew)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the #3 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as Moot as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/22/2019. (AHI)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT per #6 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Industrial Manufacturing Specialties Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Langston, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Industrial Manufacturing Specialties Inc. (Langston, David)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #3 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by May 15, 2019, and any reply due by May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/24/2019. (NDH)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Andrew)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by FedEx Corporate Services Inc, FedEx Ground Package System Inc, Federal Express Corporation. (Anderson, Andrew)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 04/19/19. (SPT )
April 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601096925 (BJL)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Corporate Services Inc, FedEx Ground Package System Inc, Federal Express Corporation from Circuit Court of Morgan County, Alabama, case number 52-CV-2019-900139 filed by FedEx Corporate Services Inc, FedEx Ground Package System Inc, Federal Express Corporation. Jury demand contained within the body of the complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Manufacturing Specialties Inc v. Federal Express Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System Inc
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corporate Services Inc
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Manufacturing Specialties Inc
Represented By: Patrick E. Sebesta, II
Represented By: David W Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?