Alabama Space Science Exhibit Commission v. Merkel American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alabama Space Science Exhibit Commission
Defendant: Merkel American Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00594
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alabama Space Science Exhibit Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Knight v ASSEC)(Kaufmann, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Merkel American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Finch, Fredrick)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Response due by May 31, 2019, and any reply is due by June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/13/2019. (NDH)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alabama Space Science Exhibit Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Louie Ramirez, #2 Exhibit 2 - RFP for Architectural Services, #3 Exhibit 3 - Appointment Letter DAG Daniel Kaufmann, #4 Exhibit 4 - BiAnnual Inventory Letters 2002 to 2016, #5 Exhibit 5 - Examiners Report 2007 to 2012, #6 Exhibit 6 - Govt Auditing Standards, #7 Exhibit 7 - EBO Quarterly Performance Report Request, #8 Exhibit 8 - FY18 Agency Budget Request, #9 Exhibit 9 - EBO Quarterly Performance Report Request, #10 Exhibit 10 - Executive Budget FY17, #11 Exhibit 11 - ETF FY2007-FY2018 Appropriations, #12 Exhibit 12 - 2015 CAFR, #13 Exhibit 13 - Request for Out-of-State Travel, #14 Exhibit 14 - Division of Risk Management 17 Invoice)(Kaufmann, Daniel)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merkel American Insurance Company. filed by Merkel American Insurance Company (Finch, Fredrick)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Merkel American Insurance Company.(Finch, Fredrick)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 04/19/19. (SPT )
April 18, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3327029 (B4601096929). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merkel American Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-900567 filed by Merkel American Insurance Company with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(AHI). (Finch, Fredrick)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merkel American Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-900567 filed by Merkel American Insurance Company with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alabama Space Science Exhibit Commission v. Merkel American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Space Science Exhibit Commission
Represented By: Daniel Kaufmann
Represented By: Hallman B Eady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merkel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Fredrick Lane Finch, Jr
Represented By: Brian C Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?