Singleton v. Flynt et al

Plaintiff: Jason Singleton
Defendant: Mark Hendricks, Reanna Paige Tripp, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company and Chrysta Flynt
Case Number: 5:2019cv00674
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Vacate Deadlines. Plaintiff has informed the Court that the parties have reached a settlement and requests that deadlines be stayed. Therefore, the Court will stay all current deadlines until July 5, 2019. If a joint stipulation of dismissal is not filed by that date, the stay will be lifted. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/6/2019. (NDH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement in Principle and MOTION to Vacate All Deadlines by Jason Singleton. (AHI)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Plaintiff's unavailability from June 13, 2019 though June 18, 2019 by Jason Singleton (AHI)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNIGN ALL FURTHER PROCEEDING - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 6/3/2019. (AHI )
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Reanna Paige Tripp.(Trousdale, Albert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chrysta Flynt.(Trousdale, Albert)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the motion to set aside entry of default is GRANTED; it is ORDERED that the Clerk's entry of default is SET ASIDE and Defendant, Flynn is ORDERED to file a responsive pleading to the complaint by 5/31/2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/31/2019. (AHI)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Chrysta Flynt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Trousdale, Albert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 ***SET ASIDE PER ORDERED ISSUED ON 5/31/2019*** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Chrysta Flynt (AHI)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION For Clerk's Entry of Default Against Chrysta Flynt and Affidavit in Support of Default Request by Jason Singleton (Attachments: #1 Order)(AHI)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline #5 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by Wednesday, June 12, 2019, and any reply due by Friday, June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 5/30/2019. (NDH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Franklin, Patrick)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Singleton. Chrysta Flynt served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019; Progressive Specialty Insurance Company served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019; Reanna Paige Tripp served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (AHI)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DOES one to ten inclusive, Chrysta Flynt, Mark Hendricks, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, and Reanna Paige Tripp by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing by Jason Singleton (BJL)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Chrysta Flynt, Mark Hendricks, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, and Reanna Paige Tripp (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number: H4601004045) filed by Jason Singleton.(BJL) Modified on 5/6/2019 (SPT ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Flynt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hendricks
Represented By: Patrick W Franklin
Represented By: Paul Albert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reanna Paige Tripp
Represented By: Albert J Trousdale, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick W Franklin
Represented By: Paul Albert Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysta Flynt
Represented By: Albert J Trousdale, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?