American Advisors Group v. United States of America Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: American Advisors Group
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 5:2019cv00697
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER consistent with the plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice #4 , this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/30/2019. (AFS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Advisors Group (Gaston, George)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE by American Advisors Group re #1 Complaint (Gaston, George)
May 13, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number B4601097634 (AFS)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Advisors Group. filed by American Advisors Group (Gaston, George)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America Internal Revenue Service, filed by American Advisors Group. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 D, #5 E, #6 F, #7 G, #8 H)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Advisors Group v. United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Advisors Group
Represented By: George C Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?