Morris v. Carlota et al
Plaintiff: Aarolyn Morris
Defendant: Carlota OB-GYN, P.C., MD Oliver Carlota, Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Atherns-Limestone Hospital, Doris Stewart, Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital and HH Health System- Athens Limestone LLC, d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital
Case Number: 5:2019cv00707
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Oliver Carlota, Carlota OB-GYN, P.C..(Juliano, Jasper)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Oliver Carlota, Carlota OB-GYN, P.C., HH Health System- Athens Limestone LLC, d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital, Doris Stewart mailed certified mail. (AFS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Carlota OB-GYN, P.C. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (AFS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aarolyn Morris, filed by Aarolyn Morris.(Williams, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N Bailey, II on behalf of Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital, Doris Stewart (Bailey, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Kelly on behalf of Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital, Doris Stewart (Kelly, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F Beasley on behalf of Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital, Doris Stewart (Beasley, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital, Doris Stewart re #1 Complaint (Beasley, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aarolyn Morris. Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation, Inc. d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019; Doris Stewart served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (JLC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Oliver Carlota served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (AFS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital, Oliver Carlota, Carlota OB-GYN, P.C., Doris Stewart mailed certified mail. (AFS)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joel Williams and Timothy J. Williams for Aarolyn Morris added. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 5/16/2019. (JLC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Aarolyn Morris. (Attachments: #1 Summons for all Defendants)(Williams, Timothy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion Pro Hac Vice by Aarolyn Morris. (Williams, Timothy)
May 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $50, receipt number (ALND 4601097584) 1126-3343494. (Williams, Timothy) Modified on 5/10/2019 (AFS).
May 9, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number (ALND B4601097588) 1126-3343099. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital, Oliver Carlota, Carlota OB-GYN, P.C., Doris Stewart, filed by Aarolyn Morris.(AFS). (Williams, Timothy) Modified on 5/10/2019 (AFS).
May 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number (ALND B4601097582) 1126-3343094. (Williams, Timothy) Modified on 5/10/2019 (AFS).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Atherns-Limestone Hospital, Oliver Carlota, Carlota OB-GYN, P.C., Doris Stewart, filed by Aarolyn Morris.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Carlota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlota OB-GYN, P.C.
Represented By: Paul M Juliano
Represented By: Jasper P Juliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Oliver Carlota
Represented By: Paul M Juliano
Represented By: Jasper P Juliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Atherns-Limestone Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Stewart
Represented By: Daniel F Beasley
Represented By: Robert N Bailey, II
Represented By: Jeffrey T Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens-Limestone Hospital Foundation Inc d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital
Represented By: Daniel F Beasley
Represented By: Robert N Bailey, II
Represented By: Jeffrey T Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HH Health System- Athens Limestone LLC, d/b/a Athens-Limestone Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aarolyn Morris
Represented By: Timothy J Williams
Represented By: Cameron L Hogan
Represented By: Joel Williams
Represented By: Timothy Joel Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?