Williams v. The Toro Company

Plaintiff: Edwin Williams
Defendant: The Toro Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00742
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Protective Order. QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/11/19. (BJL)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. The court ORDERS the parties to file a status report updating the court of their efforts to mediate and resolve the dispute by Friday, August 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/11/19. (BJL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (HIPAA) Motion is RIPE 6/10/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by The Toro Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Cobb, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Mediation Effort by The Toro Company. (Cobb, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. The Toro Company served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (BJL)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for servicw as to The Toro Company. (AHI)
May 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3347039 (receipt number B4601097714). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Toro Company filed by Edwin Williams.(BJL). (Conchin, Gary) Modified on 5/16/2019 (BJL).
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Edwin Williams. (BJL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Toro Company filed by Edwin Williams.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. The Toro Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Toro Company
Represented By: William P Cobb, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Williams
Represented By: Gary V Conchin
Represented By: Kenneth Bridges Cole, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?