Whitthorne v. The PNC Financial Services Group
Plaintiff: Linda D. Whitthorne
Defendant: The PNC Financial Services Group
Case Number: 5:2019cv00770
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/16/2019. (CT)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/16/2019. (CT)
July 15, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3389662 (B4601099120). (Lockwood, Robert)
July 15, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3389650 (B4601099121). (Lockwood, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Erin Dougherty Foley by The PNC Financial Services Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Local Counsel)(Lockwood, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Irby by The PNC Financial Services Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Consent of Local Counsel)(Lockwood, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Linda D. Whitthorne EEOC Disclosure (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Response & EEOC Charge)(Ford, Kimberly)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/10/2019. (AHI)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-cv-770-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by The PNC Financial Services Group Corporate Disclosure Statement (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Lockwood, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant PNC Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by The PNC Financial Services Group. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Lockwood, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to Plaintiff's complaint by July 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/20/19. (LBG, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Motion is RIPE 6/20/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by The PNC Financial Services Group. (Lockwood, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda D. Whitthorne. The PNC Financial Services Group served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Ford, Kimberly)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The PNC Financial Services Group by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service via certified mail. (BJL)
May 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3353895 (receipt number B4601097935). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The PNC Financial Services Group filed by Linda D. Whitthorne. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BJL). (Ford, Kimberly) Modified on 5/28/2019 (BJL).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The PNC Financial Services Group filed by Linda D. Whitthorne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitthorne v. The PNC Financial Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda D. Whitthorne
Represented By: Kimberly Adina Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The PNC Financial Services Group
Represented By: Erin Dougherty Foley
Represented By: Robert C Lockwood
Represented By: Elizabeth D Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?