Halsey v. Alltran Financial LP
Plaintiff: Tamara Halsey
Defendant: Alltran Financial LP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00786
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Ms. Halsey has responded to the Court's order to show cause. Ms. Halsey reports that the parties have reached a tentative settlement agreement. (Doc. #10 , p. 1). The Court stays all deadlines in this case. The parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal or status report on or before August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/17/2019. (JLC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to re #9 Order to Show Cause filed by Tamara Halsey. (Philipps, David)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - To date, Alltran has not responded to Ms. Halseys complaint, and Ms. Halsey has not moved for entry of default against Alltran. Consequently, the Court directs Ms. Halsey to show cause by July 31, 2019, why the Court should not dismiss her case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/10/2019. (KEK)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/11/2019. (KEK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamara Halsey. Alltran Financial LP served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (KEK)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alltran Financial LP. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Tamara Halsey (Sykstus, Ronald)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS Attorneys David J. Philipps' and Mary E. Philipps' motion for admission pro hac vice. (Doc. #3 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/23/2019. (YMB)
May 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3353829 (ALND B4601097933). (Philipps, David) Modified on 5/24/2019 (KEK).
May 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3353828 (ALND B4601097932). (Philipps, David) Modified on 5/24/2019 (KEK).
May 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3353827 (ALND B4601097929) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Alltran Financial LP, filed by Tamara Halsey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KEK). (Philipps, David) Modified on 5/24/2019 (KEK).
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Tamara Halsey. (KEK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tamara Halsey. (KEK)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alltran Financial LP, filed by Tamara Halsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halsey v. Alltran Financial LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alltran Financial LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Halsey
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?