Spyderco Inc v. Quick Knife Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Spyderco Inc
Defendant: Quick Knife Company LLC and Greg Quick
Case Number: 5:2019cv00795
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Greg Quick and Quick Knife Company LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
June 14, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601098436 (BJL)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/14/19. (BJL)
June 13, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3367686 (receipt number B4601098435). (Wood, Edward) Modified on 6/14/2019 (BJL).
June 13, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3367683 (receipt number B460098434). (Wood, Edward) Modified on 6/14/2019 (BJL).
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kendria E. Pearson Motion is RIPE 6/13/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Spyderco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kendria Pearson)(Wood, Edward)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tara K. Hawkes Motion is RIPE 6/13/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Spyderco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tara Hawkes)(Wood, Edward)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert R. Brunelli Motion is RIPE 6/13/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Spyderco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brunelli Affidavit)(Wood, Edward)
May 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3354601 (receipt number B4601097954). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Greg Quick and Quick Knife Company LLC filed by Spyderco Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(BJL). (Wood, Edward) Modified on 5/28/2019 (BJL).
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Spyderco Inc. (BJL)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Spyderco Inc. (BJL)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Greg Quick and Quick Knife Company LLC filed by Spyderco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spyderco Inc v. Quick Knife Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Knife Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spyderco Inc
Represented By: Edward K Wood, Jr
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Represented By: Tara K Hawkes
Represented By: Kendria E Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?