Rusk v. National Credit Adjusters LLC
Plaintiff: Malinda Rusk
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00825
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Schexnailder, Rachael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Toomey Schexnailder on behalf of National Credit Adjusters LLC (Schexnailder, Rachael)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER that the Telephone Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 09:30 AM has been CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/15/2019. (LMC, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/15/2019. (AHI)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-cv-825-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than August 15, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/2/19. (BJL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 8/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/2/19. (BJL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/2/19. (BJL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Credit Adjusters LLC. filed by National Credit Adjusters LLC (Moore, Neal)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National Credit Adjusters LLC.(Moore, Neal)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed: National Credit Adjusters LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (BJL)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to National Credit Adjusters LLC. (AHI )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/4/2019. (LMC, )
May 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3357308 (receipt number B4601098041). (Philipps, David) Modified on 5/31/2019 (BJL).
May 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, receipt number 1126-3357307 (receipt number B4601098040). (Philipps, David) Modified on 5/31/2019 (BJL).
May 30, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3357306 (receipt number B4601098039). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against National Credit Adjusters LLC filed by Malinda Rusk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BJL). (Philipps, David) Modified on 5/31/2019 (BJL).
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Malinda Rusk (Sykstus, Ronald)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 5/30/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Malinda Rusk. (BJL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Malinda Rusk. (BJL)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against National Credit Adjusters LLC filed by Malinda Rusk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rusk v. National Credit Adjusters LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Rusk
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters LLC
Represented By: Rachael Toomey Schexnailder
Represented By: Neal D Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?