Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Graco Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Blame Music, ARC/Conrad Music LLC, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Brew Music Company, Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Rondor Music International, Inc. and Manchaca Music
Defendant: Trena Grant and Graco Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00935
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Graco Services Inc and Trena Grant. (BJL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Graco Services Inc served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019; Trena Grant served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (BJL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Graco Services Inc and Trena Grant by Clerk for service by certified mail. (SPT )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Blame Music, Brew Music Company, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Manchaca Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Pewitt, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3376250 (B4601098622). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Graco Services Inc and Trena Grant filed by Brew Music Company, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, ARC/Conrad Music LLC, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Manchaca Music, Blame Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., and Rondor Music International, Inc..(BJL). (Pewitt, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by ARC/Conrad Music LLC, Blame Music, Brew Music Company, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Manchaca Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, and Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (BJL)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Graco Services Inc and Trena Grant filed by Brew Music Company, Sony/ATV Songs, LLC, ARC/Conrad Music LLC, EMI Consortium Songs Inc, Manchaca Music, Blame Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., and Rondor Music International, Inc..(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Graco Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blame Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARC/Conrad Music LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs Inc
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs, LLC
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brew Music Company
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manchaca Music
Represented By: James P Pewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trena Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graco Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?