Patton v. Merriweather et al
Plaintiff: Xavian Patton
Defendant: Edwinta Merriweather and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 5:2019cv00937
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Edwinta Merriweather. (AFS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Xavian Patton.(Emerson, Jay)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xavian Patton. (Emerson, Jay)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xavian Patton. (Emerson, Jay)
July 8, 2019 Set Deadlines: United States Postal Service answer due 8/31/2019. (AFS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xavian Patton. (Emerson, Jay)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xavian Patton. United States Postal Service served on 7/2/2019, answer due 8/31/2019. (Emerson, Jay) Modified on 7/8/2019 (AFS).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service given back to plaintiff for service. (AFS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edwinta Merriweather mailed certified mail. (AFS)
June 24, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number H4601004100 (AFS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Xavian Patton. (AFS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edwinta Merriweather, United States Postal Service, filed by Xavian Patton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Merriweather et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavian Patton
Represented By: Jay E Emerson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwinta Merriweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?