Gage v. The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc
Plaintiff: Kirsten Gage
Defendant: The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc and Healthcare Authority of The City of Huntsville
Case Number: 5:2019cv01076
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kirsten Gage. Healthcare Authority of The City of Huntsville waiver sent on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/12/2019. (Mastando, Teresa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc, filed by Kirsten Gage.(Mastando, Teresa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirsten Gage. The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Mastando, Teresa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
July 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3388214 (receipt number B4601099066). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc filed by Kirsten Gage. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BJL). (Mastando, Teresa) Modified on 7/12/2019 (BJL).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc filed by Kirsten Gage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gage v. The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Gage
Represented By: Teresa Ryder Mastando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntsville Hospital Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Authority of The City of Huntsville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?