Easley v. RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC

Plaintiff: Timothy Easley
Defendant: RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01083
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC and Timothy Easley.. (BJL)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than September 20, 2019; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after September 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/12/2019. (AHI)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this action is set for a Telephone Conference on 9/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/12/2019. (AHI )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26 as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/12/2019. (AHI )
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC.(Ingram, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L Ingram on behalf of RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC (Ingram, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (BJL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
July 11, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3387893 (receipt number B4601099059). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC filed by Timothy Easley.(BJL). (Farris, Kirby) Modified on 7/12/2019 (BJL).
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Timothy Easley. (BJL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Conflict Disclosure by Timothy Easley. (BJL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC filed by Timothy Easley.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easley v. RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Easley
Represented By: Kirby D Farris
Represented By: Meredith Kay Maitrejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLJ-McLarty-Landers Automotive Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?