Underwood v. SD-Missouri, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debra J. Underwood
Defendant: Alonzo Rozier and SD-Missouri, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01104
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alonzo Rozier.(Sheffield, John)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/21/2019. (KSS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 1:15 PM; Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 at 1:15 PM; BOTH in US Post Office & Courthouse, Decatur, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/19/2019. (AFS)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra J. Underwood. Alonzo Rozier served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (DeFatta, Philip)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to Alonzo Rozier returned to plaintiff for service. (AFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SD-Missouri, LLC. filed by SD-Missouri, LLC (Sheffield, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Alonzo Rozier. (Unclaimed unable to forward) (AFS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SD-Missouri, LLC.(Sheffield, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed SD-Missouri, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (AFS)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alonzo Rozier, SD-Missouri, LLC. mailed certified mail. (AFS)
July 16, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3391327, NDAL receipt #B4601099173.(DeFatta, Philip) Modified on 7/16/2019 (JLC).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Debra J. Underwood. (JLC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alonzo Rozier and SD-Missouri, LLC, filed by Debra J. Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwood v. SD-Missouri, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonzo Rozier
Represented By: John W Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SD-Missouri, LLC
Represented By: John W Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra J. Underwood
Represented By: Philip M DeFatta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?