Orr v. Russell Forest Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frank Orr
Defendant: Russell Forest Products, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01173
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Based upon consent to dispositive jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge by the parties, the Telephone Conference set for September 18, 2019 is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/16/19. (BJL)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/16/19. (BJL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Frank Orr and Russell Forest Products, Inc.. (BJL)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than October 3, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/21/19. (BJL)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/22/19. (BJL) Modified on 9/16/2019 (BJL).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/22/19. (BJL)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Russell Forest Products, Inc.. filed by Russell Forest Products, Inc. (Brown, Whitney)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Russell Forest Products, Inc..(Brown, Whitney)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Russell Forest Products, Inc. served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (BJL)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Russell Forest Products, Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
July 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601099344 (BJL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Frank Orr. (BJL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Russell Forest Products, Inc. filed by Frank Orr.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. Russell Forest Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Orr
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Forest Products, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney R Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?