Ashley et al v. Tyson Farms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Ashley, Bullheaded, LLC D/B/A The Bullpen Steakhouse, Charles Richard Corry and Bullheaded LLC
Defendant: Hydraservice Inc, Jason Spann, Tyson Farms, Inc. and Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01180
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Tyson Farms, Inc.. (Pennington, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board, Inc., Responses due by 9/24/2019, Replies due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/10/2019. (CT)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board, Inc. by Tiffany Ashley, Bullheaded LLC, Charles Richard Corry. (Owen, Justin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin C Owen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Owen, Justin)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hydraservice Inc answer due on or before 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/22/2019. (CT)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hydraservice Inc. (Balogh, Bryan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board Inc. (Burgess, James)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 08/19/19. (SPT )
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1180-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Jason Spann shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' complaint by September 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/16/19. (LBG, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint Motion is RIPE 8/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jason Spann. (Noles, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tiffany Ashley. Tyson Farms, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Vick, Joshua)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hydraservice Inc, Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board Inc, Jason Spann, and Tyson Farms, Inc. by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
July 26, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3398856 (receipt number B4601099384). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Hydraservice Inc, Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board Inc, Jason Spann, and Tyson Farms, Inc. filed by Tiffany Ashley, Bullheaded, LLC D/B/A The Bullpen Steakhouse, and Charles Richard Corry.(BJL). (Vick, Joshua) Modified on 7/30/2019 (BJL).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Hydraservice Inc, Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board Inc, Jason Spann, and Tyson Farms, Inc. filed by Tiffany Ashley, Bullheaded, LLC D/B/A The Bullpen Steakhouse, and Charles Richard Corry.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley et al v. Tyson Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Ashley
Represented By: Dennis E Goldasich, Jr
Represented By: Joshua M Vick
Represented By: Robert O Bryan
Represented By: Justin C Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bullheaded, LLC D/B/A The Bullpen Steakhouse
Represented By: Dennis E Goldasich, Jr
Represented By: Joshua M Vick
Represented By: Robert O Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Richard Corry
Represented By: Dennis E Goldasich, Jr
Represented By: Joshua M Vick
Represented By: Robert O Bryan
Represented By: Justin C Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bullheaded LLC
Represented By: Dennis E Goldasich, Jr
Represented By: Joshua M Vick
Represented By: Robert O Bryan
Represented By: Justin C Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydraservice Inc
Represented By: R Frank Springfield
Represented By: Douglas Matthew Centeno
Represented By: Bryan O Balogh
Represented By: Robert S W Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Spann
Represented By: James L Noles, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Angela Marie Schaefer
Represented By: Zachary A Madonia
Represented By: Edward S Sledge, IV
Represented By: Scott B Smith
Represented By: Michael R Pennington
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Water Works and Sewer Board Inc
Represented By: Scott M Roberts
Represented By: James Thomas Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?