Clemons v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Plaintiff: Rhonda Prince Clemons
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01264
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER the Telephone Conference set for October 7, 2019, is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/4/2019. (AHI)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER that the court CANCELS the telephone status conference set for 10/7/2019 at 10:15 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/19. (LBG, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/23/2019. (AHI)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1264-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than October 21, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/6/19. (BJL)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 10/7/2019 at 10:15 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/6/19. (BJL)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/6/19. (BJL)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A..(Miller, Zachary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Miller, Zachary)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda Prince Clemons. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Blacksher, Wesley)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (AHI)
August 7, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3407008 (receipt number B4601099688). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. filed by Rhonda Prince Clemons.(BJL). (Blacksher, Wesley) Modified on 8/8/2019 (BJL).
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. filed by Rhonda Prince Clemons.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Prince Clemons
Represented By: Wesley Haas Blacksher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Rachel M Cash
Represented By: Zachary D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?