Sivokozov v. Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP et al
Plaintiff: Igor Sivokozov
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Scott Stokes, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, ARCP-GP LLC, GSH of Alabama LLC and Barbara Stokes
3Rd Party Defendant: Eric Yan, Habibollah Jahaniyan, Mohammod Ali Foroutantan, Jong Wook Lee, Mohammad R. Nezamabadi, Sun Young Kim, Yuying Zhao, Aekyung Lee, Alabama Center For Foreign Investment LLC, S. Miyamoto, Boyd F. Campbell, Fattaneh Vasseghi and Ron Drinkard
Case Number: 5:2019cv01274
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Alabama Center For Foreign Investment LLC.(Davis, Gregory)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 4/30/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 8/24/2020; Trial ready by 9/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/4/2019. (AHI)
October 4, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint by Eric Yan, Yuying Zhao.(Clark, John)
October 4, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Coulter, Benjamin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Coulter, Benjamin)
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by ARCP-GP LLC, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, GSH of Alabama LLC, Barbara Stokes, Scott Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Schilleci, Joseph)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Eric Yan answer due 10/9/2019; Yuying Zhao answer due 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/30/2019. (NDH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Eric Yan, Yuying Zhao. (Clark, John)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Clark, IV on behalf of Eric Yan, Yuying Zhao (Clark, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Sun Young Kim. UNCLAIMED RETURN TO SENDER UNABLE TO FORWARD (AHI)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Mohammad Ali Foroutanian answer due 10/9/2019; Habibollah Jahanian answer due 10/9/2019; Sun Young Kim answer due 10/9/2019; Aekyung Lee answer due 10/9/2019; Jong Wook Lee answer due 10/9/2019; Shinya Miyamoto answer due 10/9/2019; Mohammad R. Nezamabadi answer due 10/9/2019; Fattaneh Vasseghi answer due 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/10/2019. (NDH, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Admission of John R. Floss Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/10/2019. (NDH)
September 9, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3430580 (B4601100509). (Floss, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mohammod Ali Foroutantan, Habibollah Jahaniyan, Sun Young Kim, Aekyung Lee, Jong Wook Lee, S. Miyamoto, Mohammad R. Nezamabadi, Fattaneh Vasseghi. (Shabani, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION Pro Hac Vice Status for Attorney John R. Floss by Mohammod Ali Foroutantan, Habibollah Jahaniyan, Sun Young Kim, Aekyung Lee, Jong Wook Lee, S. Miyamoto, Mohammad R. Nezamabadi, Fattaneh Vasseghi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shabani, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Report of parties' planning meeting due on or before November 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/9/2019. (NDH)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/9/2019. (NDH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by ARCP-GP LLC, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, GSH of Alabama LLC, Barbara Stokes, Scott Stokes. (Schilleci, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/3/2019. (NDH)
August 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601100241 (AHI)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven Dickstein by Igor Sivokozov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Coulter, Benjamin)
August 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3424086 (B4601100227). (Coulter, Benjamin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hilda Piloto by Igor Sivokozov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Coulter, Benjamin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Eric Yan no date given on green card with signature(AHI)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Alias Summons Issued as to Alabama Center For Foreign Investment LLC, Boyd F. Campbell, and Ron Drinkard by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/27/2019. (NDH)
August 27, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3420712 (receipt number B4601100143). (Schilleci, Joseph) Modified on 8/28/2019 (BJL).
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fattaneh Vasseghi served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (AHI) Modified on 8/27/2019 (AHI).
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaim by Igor Sivokozov. (Coulter, Benjamin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ARCP-GP LLC, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, GSH of Alabama LLC, Barbara Stokes, Scott Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schilleci, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mohammod Ali Foroutantan served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Habibollah Jahaniyan served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Aekyung Lee served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Jong Wook Lee served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Mohammad R. Nezamabadi served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; and Yuying Zhao served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (AHI)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ron Drinkard, Boyd F. Campbell, and Alabama Center For Foreign Investment LLC. "NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDREDDED UNABLE TO FORWARD" (AHI)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed S. Miyamoto no date given with signature (AHI)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 THIRD PARTY Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Alabama Center For Foreign Investment LLC, Boyd F. Campbell, Ron Drinkard, Mohammod Ali Foroutantan, Habibollah Jahaniyan, Sun Young Kim, Aekyung Lee, Jong Wook Lee, S. Miyamoto, Mohammad R. Nezamabadi, Fattaneh Vasseghi, Eric Yan, and Yuying Zhao. (AHI)
August 14, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3412216 (b4601099878). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-9001167 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Court Files)(AHI ). (Schilleci, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNIGN ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/12/2019. (AHI)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by ARCP-GP LLC, ARCP-GP LLC, ARCP-GP LLC, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, GSH of Alabama LLC, GSH of Alabama LLC, GSH of Alabama LLC, Igor Sivokozov, Barbara Stokes, Barbara Stokes, Barbara Stokes, Scott Stokes, Scott Stokes, Scott Stokes. (Schilleci, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Igor Sivokozov, COUNTERCLAIM against Igor Sivokozov by ARCP-GP LLC, Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP, GSH of Alabama LLC, Barbara Stokes, Scott Stokes.(Schilleci, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-9001167 filed by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Files)(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivokozov v. Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Sivokozov
Represented By: Benjamin B Coulter
Represented By: Steven Dickstein
Represented By: Hilda Piloto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Scott Stokes
Represented By: Joseph P Schilleci, Jr
Represented By: Jason P Tortorici
Represented By: Arthur W Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Alabama Regional-Center Project I, LP
Represented By: Joseph P Schilleci, Jr
Represented By: Jason P Tortorici
Represented By: Arthur W Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ARCP-GP LLC
Represented By: Joseph P Schilleci, Jr
Represented By: Jason P Tortorici
Represented By: Arthur W Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GSH of Alabama LLC
Represented By: Joseph P Schilleci, Jr
Represented By: Jason P Tortorici
Represented By: Arthur W Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Barbara Stokes
Represented By: Joseph P Schilleci, Jr
Represented By: Jason P Tortorici
Represented By: Arthur W Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Eric Yan
Represented By: John W Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Habibollah Jahaniyan
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mohammod Ali Foroutantan
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jong Wook Lee
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mohammad R. Nezamabadi
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sun Young Kim
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Yuying Zhao
Represented By: John W Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Aekyung Lee
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Alabama Center For Foreign Investment LLC
Represented By: Gregory L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: S. Miyamoto
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Boyd F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fattaneh Vasseghi
Represented By: Michael Moosavi Shabani
Represented By: John Russell Floss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ron Drinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?