Lewis v. Alabama Department of Mental Health et al
Petitioner: Robert Evans Lewis, III
Respondent: Alabama Department of Mental Health and Ron Puckett
Case Number: 5:2019cv01344
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Petitioner's #4 MOTION to Dismiss which the Court construes as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Accordingly, this #1 Petition is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, costs to be taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/3/2019. (JLC)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Evans Lewis, III. (JLC)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER On August 19, 2019, United States District Judge Abdul K. Kallon dismissed Petitioner's previous habeas petition and ordered the amended petition he filed in that action be opened as a new habeas petition. (See #1 ). Because this is a new habeas action, Petitioner is required to pay the $5.00 filing fee or move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner must submit the filing fee or an IFP application by September 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(PSM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Evans Lewis, III.(AFS)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FINAL ORDER in accordance with the Memo Op contemporaneously filed herewith, it is ORDERED that the petition for writ of habeas corpus be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo Op)(AFS) Modified on 8/20/2019 Petition #2 was originally filed as amended petition in 5:18-cv-01187-AKK-JHE (PSM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Alabama Department of Mental Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Evans Lewis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alabama Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?