Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Stevens et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Winners's LLC and Kenneth Stevens
Case Number: 5:2019cv01363
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Kenneth Stevens served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Gamble, F.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Winners's LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Gamble, F.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Kenneth Stevens and Winners's LLC. (AHI)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Gamble, F.)
August 27, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3421819(B46010110169) related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(AHI ). (Gamble, F.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(AHI )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Stevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winners's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?