Pelayo v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Jose Pelayo, Jr.
Defendant: Carl Marquis Smith, GEICO Casualty Company and ICU Monitoring Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01366
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 9/30/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2020; Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 11/14/2020; Trial ready by 12/2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/4/2019. (AHI)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Warren, J)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by ICU Monitoring Inc. (Wilson, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 JOINDER in re #1 Petition for Removal (by Carl Marquis Smith) filed by ICU Monitoring Inc. (Wilson, David)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/23/2019. (AHI)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE - Answer filed in State Court by GEICO Casualty Company (DEEMED Filed 7/31/2019) (AHI)
August 22, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3418295 (B4601100076). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ICU Monitoring Inc from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Alabama, case number 39-cv-2019-900169 with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint filed by ICU Monitoring Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Petition for Removal, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 part 1, # 5 Exhibit 3 part 2, # 6 Exhibit 3 part 3, # 7 Exhibit 3 part 4, # 8 Exhibit 3 part 5, # 9 Exhibit 3 part 6, # 10 Exhibit 3 part 7, # 11 Exhibit 3 part 8, # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit 6, # 15 Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit 8)(AHI). (Wilson, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ICU Monitoring Inc. (AHI)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ICU Monitoring Inc from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Alabama, case number 39-cv-2019-900169 with jury demand contained within the body of the complaint filed by ICU Monitoring Inc. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 part 1, #5 Exhibit 3 part 2, #6 Exhibit 3 part 3, #7 Exhibit 3 part 4, #8 Exhibit 3 part 5, #9 Exhibit 3 part 6, #10 Exhibit 3 part 7, #11 Exhibit 3 part 8, #12 Exhibit 4, #13 Exhibit 5, #14 Exhibit 6, #15 Exhibit 7, #16 Exhibit 8)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelayo v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Pelayo, Jr.
Represented By: Morris Lilienthal
Represented By: Derek W Simpson
Represented By: Hunter Scott Garnett
Represented By: J Barton Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Marquis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: David R Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICU Monitoring Inc
Represented By: David M Wilson
Represented By: Devona J Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?