Howard v. Shelton et al
Plaintiff: Debra Howard
Defendant: Adam Nicholas Shelton, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company and Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 5:2019cv01377
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER; Defendant Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company has filed a motion to compel discovery, (Doc. #3 ), and a supplemental motion to compel discovery, (Doc. #9 ). The Court SETS this matter for a telephone conference at 1:00 PM on Tuesday, October 22, 2019. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the call. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/16/2019. (JLC)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The re #14 Uniform Initial Order (Boyles, Kenneth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The re #14 Uniform Initial Order (McCurry, Susan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The re #14 Uniform Initial Order (Isenberg, Joel)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/10/2019. (YMB)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/13/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2020. Status Conference set for Monday, 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. See Order for other deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/10/2019. (YMB)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/10/2019. (KEK)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 10/10/2019. (KEK)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1377-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Name of Defendant Travelers by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Boyles, Kenneth)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Boyles, Kenneth)
September 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2019. (SHB, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Supplemental MOTION to Compel (Supplement to Doc. 3) by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - August 8 Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - September 12 Email)(Boyles, Kenneth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Boyles, Jr on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company (Boyles, Kenneth)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than October 7, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 9/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Defendant filed a Motion to Compel. (Doc. 3). Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion within fourteen (14) days from the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file any reply within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3420140 (Receipt number B4601100140). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company from The Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Alabama, case number 42-CV-2018-900124. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(BJL). (McCurry, Susan) Modified on 8/27/2019 (BJL).
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (BJL)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial.(BJL)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company from The Circuit Court of Lawrence County, Alabama, case number 42-CV-2018-900124. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Shelton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Nicholas Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan H McCurry
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Susan H McCurry
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Represented By: Kenneth W Boyles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Howard
Represented By: Paul Anthony Spina, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?