Smith v. Badger Daylighting Corp
Plaintiff: Jared Smith
Defendant: Badger Daylighting Corp
Case Number: 5:2019cv01380
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: based upon the parties' notice that all claims herein have been resolved, all claims are DISMISSED with PREJUDICE. Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/26/19. (BJL)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal (JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) by Jared Smith. filed by Jared Smith (Scofield, J)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Jared Smith (PARTIES' NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) (Scofield, J)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/3/2019. (KBW)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/3/2019. (KBW)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Jared Smith by Badger Daylighting Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, William)
September 30, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601100884 Mensah; $75 receipt number B4601100885 Webb (AHI)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jamila S. Mensah by Badger Daylighting Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion)(Phillips, William)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Carolyn E. Webb by Badger Daylighting Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion)(Phillips, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint by Badger Daylighting Corp.(Phillips, William)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/11/2019. (AHI)
September 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3431333 (B4601100534). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with an Application for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction contained within the body of the Complaint by Badger Daylighting Corp from Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-cv-2019-900334 filed by Badger Daylighting Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(AHI). (Phillips, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction contained in the body of the complaint. (AHI )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Badger Daylighting Corp. filed by Badger Daylighting Corp (Phillips, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with an Application for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction contained within the body of the Complaint by Badger Daylighting Corp from Circuit Court of Cullman County, Alabama, case number 25-cv-2019-900334 filed by Badger Daylighting Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Badger Daylighting Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Smith
Represented By: J Trent Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Daylighting Corp
Represented By: William Brock Phillips
Represented By: David B Block
Represented By: Jamila S. Mensah
Represented By: Carolyn E. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?