Crossroads Building Supply Inc v. Pierce et al
Plaintiff: Crossroads Building Supply Inc
Defendant: Southern Pride Roofing and Construction LLC and Brian Pierce
Case Number: 5:2019cv01437
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/3/2019. (AHI)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Brian Pierce, Southern Pride Roofing and Construction LLC.(Heard, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D Heard on behalf of Brian Pierce, Southern Pride Roofing and Construction LLC (Heard, Kevin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crossroads Building Supply Inc. Southern Pride Roofing and Construction LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Lockwood, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crossroads Building Supply Inc. Crossroads Building Supply Inc served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Lockwood, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued by the clerk and hand delivered to plaintiff for service as to Brian Pierce and Southern Pride Roofing and Construction LLC. (AHI)
September 3, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number H4601004189 (BJL)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Pierce and Southern Pride Roofing and Construction LLC filed by Crossroads Building Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossroads Building Supply Inc v. Pierce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Pride Roofing and Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossroads Building Supply Inc
Represented By: Robert C Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?