United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation v. Hopper et al
Plaintiff: United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation
Defendant: Nina Hopper and Remain at Home Senior Care
Case Number: 5:2019cv01503
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/30/2019. (AHI)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that a hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL; the #19 temporary restraining order is EXTENDED until the Court issues a ruling on the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/3/2019. (AHI)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Consent Motion Extending Time for Defendant Remain to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Remain at Home Senior Care, LLC's response to complaint due 11/16/2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/1/2019. (NDH)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Remain at Home Senior Care. (Peters, Alyssa)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER that a hearing regarding the Preliminary Injunction is set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/01/19. (SPT )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that counsel shall submit a proposed order by 9/30/2019 to chamber that addresses the extension of the temporary restraining order as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/26/219. (AHI)
September 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2019. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (SPT )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER that a telephone conference is set for 9/25/2019 at 2:00 p.m.; Dial In Information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 09/24/19. (SPT )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER that this order shall be effective as of the date and time of entry of the court and shall expire at 5:00 PM on 10/23/2019 as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/23/2019. (AHI)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint proposed temporary restraining order in Word format to the chambers e-mail address by Friday, September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/17/19. (BJL)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/11/2019. (NDH)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/11/2019. (NDH)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Patricia-Anne Upson. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9//11/2019. (NDH)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Amended Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Alyssa K. Peters. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/11/2019. (NDH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Hopper, Remain at Home Senior Care. (Nixon, Brooke)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Hopper, Remain at Home Senior Care. (Nixon, Brooke)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke M Nixon on behalf of Nina Hopper (Nixon, Brooke)
September 11, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3431761 (B4601100536). (Nixon, Brooke)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Hopper, Remain at Home Senior Care. (Nixon, Brooke)
September 11, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3431756 (B4601100535). (Nixon, Brooke)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Hopper, Remain at Home Senior Care. (Nixon, Brooke)
September 11, 2019 Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing is RESET for 9/16/2019 01:30 p.m. in the Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Liles C Burke. (SPT )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Continue. Hearing on motion for temporary restraining order #2 is re-set for Monday, September 16, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in the second floor courtroom, U.S. Courthouse, 101 Holmes Avenue, Huntsville, AL. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/11/2019. (NDH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue by Remain at Home Senior Care. (Nixon, Brooke)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke M Nixon on behalf of Remain at Home Senior Care (Nixon, Brooke)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that a Motion Hearing is set for 9/12/2019 09:00 AM in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL, counsel for plaintiff is ORDERED to immediately serve copies of the complaint, the motion for temporary restraining order and supporting brief, and this Order on defendants and notify the Court, in writing, of the date, time, place, and manner of service. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/10/2019. (AHI )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to Nina Hopper and Remain at Home Senior Care. (AHI)
September 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3430839 (B4601100522). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Nina Hopper, Remain at Home Senior Care filed by United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(AHI). (Burgess, C)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Brief in support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. filed by United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation (AHI)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation. (AHI)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Nina Hopper, Remain at Home Senior Care filed by United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation v. Hopper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remain at Home Senior Care
Represented By: Brooke M Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Energy Workers Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: C Gregory Burgess
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Represented By: Ambria L Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?