Hill v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Maurice Hill
Defendant: McCurley and Wallace
Case Number: 5:2019cv01512
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that plaintiff again is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.94 in order to commence this action, plaintiff is also required to sign and return the attached Prisoner Consent Form within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order or the complaint will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 11/8/2019. (JLC)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to #4 Magistrate Judge's Report & Recommendation filed by Ricardo Maurice Hill. (JLC)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Ricardo Maurice Hill. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) calendar days from the date the Report and Recommendation is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/22/2019. (JLC)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Doc. #3 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The plaintiff is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.94 inorder to commence this action, and thereafter to make monthly installment paymentstoward payment of the full filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/13/2019. (KEK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricardo Maurice Hill. (KEK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCurley, Wallace, filed by Ricardo Maurice Hill.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Wallace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Maurice Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?