Thornton et al v. Southern Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany E Thornton and Shane L Thornton
Defendant: Covington Credit of Alabama Inc, John L McQuain, Southern Management Corporation and Gary L. McQuain
Case Number: 5:2019cv01523
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc, Southern Management Corporation re #21 Uniform Initial Order (Threadcraft, Joshua)
November 3, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Defendant's Response To Show Cause filed by Tiffany E Thornton. (Clark, George)
November 1, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to re #24 Order to Show Cause filed by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc, Southern Management Corporation. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; It is ORDERED that by Friday, November 1, 2019 defendants SHOW CAUSE as to why this action should not be remanded to Limestone County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/29/19. (SPT )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that Plaintiff Shane L Thornton and all claims filed by him against defendants in this action are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/29/19. (SPT )
October 27, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tiffany E Thornton.(Clark, George)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/23/2019. (AHI)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. The Telephone Conference scheduled for 11/12/19 is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/23/19. (BJL) Modified on 10/23/2019 (BJL).
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1523-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than November 25, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/11/19. (BJL)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/11/19. (BJL) Modified on 10/23/2019 (BJL).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/11/19. (BJL)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Management Corporation.(Threadcraft, Joshua)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc.(Threadcraft, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/7/19. (BJL)
October 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration by Tiffany E Thornton. (Clark, George)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's September 29, 2019, amended complaint exceeds the twenty-one day window, and Plaintiff did not seek Defendants' written consent or leave of court to file her amendment. For these reasons, Plaintiff's amended complaint violates Rule 15(a)(1)(A). The court therefore STRIKES Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/4/19. (BJL) Modified on 10/21/2019 (BJL).
September 29, 2019 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER - DOC. 11*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tiffany E Thornton.(Clark, George) Modified on 10/4/2019 (BJL).
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shane L Thornton (Clark, George)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Southern Management Corporation answer due 9/30/2019; Covington Credit of Alabama Inc answer due 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/20/19. (BJL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Motion is RIPE 9/20/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal Motion is RIPE 9/20/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Southern Management Corporation. (Threadcraft, Joshua)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc re #1 Notice of Removal Correction of Certificate of Service (Threadcraft, Joshua)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Southern Management Corporation re #2 Notice (Other) Correction of Certificate of Service (Threadcraft, Joshua)
September 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3434494 (receipt number B4601100626). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc from The Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabamd, case number 44-CV-2019-900303. (BJL). (Threadcraft, Joshua) Modified on 9/17/2019 (BJL).
September 13, 2019 COMPLAINT filed in State Court on 8/9/19. (BJL)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 SOUTHERN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Southern Management Corporation. (BJL)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covington Credit of Alabama Inc from The Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabamd, case number 44-CV-2019-900303. (BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton et al v. Southern Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Credit of Alabama Inc
Represented By: Joshua H Threadcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L McQuain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Management Corporation
Represented By: Joshua H Threadcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. McQuain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany E Thornton
Represented By: George Keith Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane L Thornton
Represented By: George Keith Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?