Atkinson v. Below the Radar LLC
Plaintiff: Carrie Atkinson
Defendant: Below the Radar LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01539
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Below the Radar, LLC; no delivery date given on green card. (BJL)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to Below the Radar LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Below the Radar LLC. Returned to Sender: Unclaimed. (BJL)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Below the Radar LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
September 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3435448 (receipt number B4601100655). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Below the Radar LLC filed by Carrie Atkinson.(BJL). (Camp, Robert) Modified on 9/30/2019 (BJL).
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Carrie Atkinson. (BJL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Below the Radar LLC filed by Carrie Atkinson.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkinson v. Below the Radar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Below the Radar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Atkinson
Represented By: Robert J Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?