Bledsoe v. Perron et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ester Bledsoe
Defendant: John Freeman Perron, Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc and BBU Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01542
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/14/2019. (YMB)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/3/2020. Dispositive motions due by 9/3/2020. Status Conference set for Monday, 8/10/2020 at 11:00 AM, CR 7B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. See Order for other deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/14/2019. (YMB)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 11/13/2019. (KEK)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1542-MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
October 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 10/16/2019. (SHB, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D Aiello on behalf of Jacqueline Ester Bledsoe (Aiello, Joseph)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shires, Kevin)
September 24, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3440783 (receipt number B4601100796). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND from The Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-901562 filed by John Freeman Perron, BBU Inc, and Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(BJL). (Shires, Kevin) Modified on 9/25/2019 (BJL).
September 24, 2019 PHV Fee paid by Kevin T. Shires: $75, receipt number B4601100777 (BJL)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than November 1, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/17/19. (BJL)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/17/19. (BJL)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/17/19. (BJL)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Brief in Support of Removal filed by BBU Inc, Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc, and John Freeman Perron. (BJL)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND from The Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-901562 filed by John Freeman Perron, BBU Inc, and Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bledsoe v. Perron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Ester Bledsoe
Represented By: Joe Alton King, Jr
Represented By: Joseph D Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Freeman Perron
Represented By: Kevin T Shires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc
Represented By: Kevin T Shires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBU Inc
Represented By: Kevin T Shires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?