ALFA Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Knox et al
Plaintiff: Mary Bowman and ALFA Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: US Postal Service and Seconda Sherrell Knox
Case Number: 5:2019cv01554
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/5/2019. (AHI)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1554-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than November 4, 2019; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after November 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/19/2019. (AHI )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that this case is set for a Telephone Conference on 10/16/2019 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/19/2019. (AHI )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the plaintiffs have 14 hays from the entry date of this order to respond to the motion to substitute party and the motion to dismiss; defendants shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/19/2019. (AHI)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss by Seconda Sherrell Knox and US Postal Service. (AHI)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party Motion is RIPE 9/18/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Seconda Sherrell Knox, US Postal Service. (AHI)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by US Postal Service and Seconda Sherrell Knox from District Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-DV-2019-901643 filed by US Postal Service and Seconda Sherrell Knox.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALFA Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Knox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bowman
Represented By: James R Esdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFA Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James R Esdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Postal Service
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seconda Sherrell Knox
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?